Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Coscia

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Targa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1692BornPetraefusorum
11 Apr 171624.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 172533.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
8 Apr 172533.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
Aug 1759³67.4DiedTitular Bishop of Targa

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Coscia:
Bishop Filippo Coscia (born , died Aug 1759) Titular Bishop of Targa

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015