Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Silvio Nicola

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1678BornTurino
2 Jun 170324.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 172748.9SelectedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
30 Jul 172749.0ConfirmedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
17 Aug 172749.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
7 Sep 173355.1DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Silvio Nicola:
Bishop Giovanni Silvio Nicola (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015