Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Chiappé, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1691BornPietra
10 Aug 171423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerónimo
20 Nov 172433.3AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
26 Nov 172433.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
Mar 1768³76.6DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Chiappé:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Chiappé O.S.H. (born , died Mar 1768) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 294
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015