Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco (Dalmazio Octavio) Vasco, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Carlo Francesco di San Giovanni della Croce)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1675Born
19 Sep 169924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
30 Jul 172751.8AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
24 Aug 172751.9Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
31 Dec 174974.3DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco (Dalmazio Octavio) Vasco
Bishop Francesco (Dalmazio Octavio) Vasco O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondovi

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 33
  • bp: CB, 20 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast