Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1670³BornVitulano
22 Mar 169222.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Mar 169424.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 172454.3AppointedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
26 Jul 172454.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy
Mar 1734³64.0DiedBishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Rossi:
Bishop Domenico Rossi (born , died Mar 1734) Bishop of Vulturara e Montecorvino

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015