Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Di Grazia

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1669³BornNapoli
19 Sep 169324.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 172758.2AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
31 Dec 172758.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
2 Dec 172960.2DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Di Grazia:
Bishop Tommaso Di Grazia (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015