Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro degli Abbati

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1681BornRoma
26 Dec 172746.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 172847.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
27 Dec 172847.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
21 May 173149.8AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
30 Apr 174866.7DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro degli Abbati
Bishop Alessandro degli Abbati (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 20.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 313
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 60
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 443

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016