Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Caccia, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1675BornVenezia
28 Nov 172954.6AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
11 Dec 172954.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
8 Jan 173155.7AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
29 Aug 173762.3ResignedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
24 Jun 175883.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Caccia:
Bishop Giuseppe Caccia O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trogir (Tra¨)

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1729, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015