Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epifanio di Napoli, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1669³BornTroina, Italy
13 Sep 168617.1ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
22 Mar 169222.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
20 Sep 169223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
20 Jan 172757.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
9 Feb 172757.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Epifanio di Napoli
Bishop Epifanio di Napoli O.S.B.M. (born ) Titular Bishop of Lystra

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Jun 2016