Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Bisleti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cisamus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1687Born
15 Feb 172840.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172840.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cisamus
8 Dec 172840.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cisamus
22 Sep 174961.7DiedTitular Bishop of Cisamus

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Bisleti
Bishop Fortunato Bisleti (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Cisamus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlvito

  • a priest for 21.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast