Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Itúrbide (Yturibe), O. Carm. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1686³BornTudela, Spain
14 Jun 171024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
31 Jul 172640.2AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
10 Aug 172640.2Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
13 Mar 172740.8ResignedBishop of Venosa, Italy
17 Mar 172740.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Side
25 Jun 172741.1AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
7 Jan 172841.6ResignedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Itúrbide (Yturibe)
Archbishop Felipe Itúrbide (Yturibe) O. Carm. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 327, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 43, Number 166
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016