Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Tercero Rozas, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Titular Bishop of Icosium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1664BornPuerto de Santa María
24 May 169834.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
26 Nov 172763.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
26 Nov 172763.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Icosium
26 Dec 172763.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Icosium
4 Jul 175288.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Tercero Rozas:
Bishop Manuel Tercero Rozas O.S.A. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 45, Number 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014