Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Caputo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1672³Born
22 Sep 169624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 Nov 172856.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
21 Nov 172856.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
21 May 173158.8AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
24 Feb 174168.5DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Caputo
Bishop Alessandro Caputo O. Carm. (born Aug 1672, died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatane

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018