Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo (Damiano) Polou

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1679BornGandía
13 Jun 172141.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 172748.0AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
30 Jun 172748.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
4 May 175676.8DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domingo (Damiano) Polou:
Archbishop Domingo (Damiano) Polou (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 44, Number 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013