Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement X

Emilio Bonaventura Altieri

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1590BornRoma
6 Apr 162433.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 162737.3AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
30 Nov 162737.3Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
25 Dec 164454.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
29 Oct 165262.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
1657²66.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
7 Jun 166675.9ResignedBishop of Camerino, Italy
1667²76.4ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
29 Nov 166979.3Elevated to Cardinal
29 Apr 167079.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
11 May 167079.8InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Jul 167686.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emilio Bonaventura Altieri (VIAF: 316874496)
Pope Emilio Bonaventura Altieri (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
  • a cardinal for .4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1627, Number 32
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 250
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016