Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Gerolamo Caravadossi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1677Born
30 Jul 170124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 May 172850.7AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
18 May 172850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
25 May 174668.8DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Gerolamo Caravadossi
Bishop Pier Gerolamo Caravadossi O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice, France

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast