Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard-Antoine Pizzella

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1686³BornCapracotta
20 Sep 171024.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172740.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
21 Feb 172740.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
23 Jan 175063.7DiedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard-Antoine Pizzella:
Bishop Bernard-Antoine Pizzella (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 170
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015