Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Maria de Laurentiis, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1672³BornGrottaglia
23 Oct 169522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
22 Dec 172755.0AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
28 Dec 172755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
20 Mar 175178.2DiedBishop of Capri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria de Laurentiis:
Bishop Giovanni Maria de Laurentiis O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Capri

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1727, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015