Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Saporiti

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1691BornGenova
13 Oct 171524.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 172635.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
22 Apr 172635.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
2 Dec 174352.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Genova, Italy
9 Mar 174655.0SucceededArchbishop of Genova, Italy
14 Apr 176776.1DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Saporiti:
Archbishop Giuseppe Saporiti (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 83
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014