Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni de Torrecilla y Cárdenas

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1623³Born
10 Nov 167552.6SelectedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
19 Oct 167653.5ConfirmedBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
28 Oct 167653.5Ordained BishopBishop of L’Aquila, Italy
17 Mar 168157.9AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
24 Jun 168865.2DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Torrecilla y Cárdenas
Archbishop Giovanni de Torrecilla y Cárdenas (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmería

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93, and Page 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 214, Number 1,334
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,676, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast