Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Lorenzo Baratta

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1679BornSavigliano
15 Jan 170222.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 172748.8AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
30 Nov 172748.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
20 Jul 174061.5DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Lorenzo Baratta:
Bishop Cristoforo Lorenzo Baratta (born , died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 205
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013