Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bianchi di Gennaro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1670BornNapoli
16 May 169424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Apr 172858.0AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
9 May 172858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
Aug 172959.3DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bianchi di Gennaro:
Bishop Antonio Bianchi di Gennaro O.F.M. Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

  • a priest for 35.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 276

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013