Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopold Heinrich Wilhelm von Schorror

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover)

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1701BornBonn
30 Sep 172826.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
2 Oct 172826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
15 Dec 172827.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
21 Dec 172827.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
10 Oct 173028.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover), Germany
1 Dec 174544.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover), Germany
21 Sep 175351.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover), Germany

MicroData Summary for Leopold Heinrich Wilhelm von Schorror:
Bishop Leopold Heinrich Wilhelm von Schorror (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Upper and Lower Saxony (Hanover)

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015