Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tiberio Muscettola, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637¹BornNapoli
13 May 168043.3AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
19 May 168043.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
25 Feb 170871.1ResignedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Muscettola:
Archbishop Tiberio Muscettola C.O. (born 1637) Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 358
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015