Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sostegno Maria Cavalli, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1672Born
26 Feb 169523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
26 Sep 172553.6AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
30 Sep 172553.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
15 Aug 174775.5DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sostegno Maria Cavalli
Bishop Sostegno Maria Cavalli O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviglio

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 197
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018