Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zozuno Valignari

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1669BornChieti
7 Nov 172353.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Nov 172353.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 172454.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
9 Jul 172454.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
26 Oct 172959.8DiedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica

MicroData Summary for Zozuno Valignari:
Archbishop Zozuno Valignari (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica

  • a priest for 5.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1724, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015