Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Antonio Lucci, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1681BornAgnone
19 Sep 170524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
7 Feb 172947.5AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
13 Feb 172947.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
Jul 175270.9DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy
18 Jun 1989Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Antonio Lucci:
Bishop Bl. Antonio Lucci O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Bovino

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013