Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Carlovich

Deceased

Bishop of Arbe (Rab)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1676³BornSplit
13 Jun 169923.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 172852.6AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
26 Dec 172852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
12 Jan 173861.7DiedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Carlovich:
Bishop Andrea Carlovich (born , died ) Bishop of Arbe (Rab)

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 95
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015