Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Vecchia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1628BornVenezia
6 Mar 169062.2AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
12 Mar 169062.2Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
19 Dec 169163.9AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
Jul 1695³67.5DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vecchia:
Bishop Pietro Vecchia O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Molfetta

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,113
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013