Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Spínola

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1681BornGenoa, Italy
Apr 1726³44.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Feb 172846.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 173352.2Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 173352.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
23 Sep 174362.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
15 Nov 175170.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
9 Apr 175270.7Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
20 Aug 175271.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Spínola:
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Spínola (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for .3 years
  • a cardinal for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1733
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 12
  • c34: CB, 11 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015