Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio de Molleda y Clerque

Deceased

Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1692BornLima, Peru
21 Dec 171523.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Apr 171623.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 172533.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
7 Oct 172533.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Isauropolis
15 Jun 172937.1SelectedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
3 Aug 172937.2ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
19 Dec 174048.6AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
14 Jul 174755.1SelectedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
4 Sep 174755.3ConfirmedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
1 Apr 175663.8DiedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Gregorio de Molleda y Clerque (VIAF: 103023267)
Archbishop Gregorio de Molleda y Clerque (born , died ) Archbishop of La Plata o Charcas

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146, and Page 230
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341, and Page 419
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 41
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jul 2016