Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Cervioni, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca

Titular Archbishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1672BornIlcinen
17 Mar 169624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
3 Jun 172654.2AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
23 Jun 172654.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
7 Feb 172956.9AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
173158.8ResignedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
21 May 173159.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Porphyreon
9 Jan 174269.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Cervioni:
Archbishop Tommaso Cervioni O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 199, and Page 247
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013