Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola de Simoni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Marciana


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jul 1725Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 1729AppointedTitular Bishop of Marciana
6 Jun 1729Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marciana

MicroData Summary for Nicola de Simoni
Bishop Nicola de Simoni , Titular Bishop of Marciana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 20
  • bp: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1744, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast