Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Maria d’Aragona, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1684Born
31 Dec 170824.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Jan 170925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
23 Jul 172541.5AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
25 Jul 172541.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
18 Apr 174359.2DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria d’Aragona
Archbishop Vincenzo Maria d’Aragona O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlexano

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 179
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast