Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maffeo Niccolò Farsetti

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1677Born
16 Mar 172749.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 172749.8AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
14 Apr 172749.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
6 Feb 174163.7DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maffeo Niccolò Farsetti
Archbishop Maffeo Niccolò Farsetti (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 13.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 329
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast