Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Feroni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1693BornFlorence, Italy
22 Oct 171926.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 172835.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
30 May 172835.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
26 Nov 175360.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175360.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
17 Dec 176471.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
15 Nov 176774.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Feroni:
Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Feroni (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015