Catholic-Hierarchy DC

NicolÚ Maria Cardinal Lercari

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1675BornTaggia, Italy
7 Dec 170429.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 172448.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
18 Jun 172448.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
14 Jun 172650.5AppointedSecretary of State
9 Dec 172651.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 172651.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
21 Feb 173054.2ResignedSecretary of State
11 Mar 174367.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
21 Mar 175781.3DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Maria Lercari:
NicolÚ Maria Cardinal Lercari (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
  • a cardinal for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1724, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015