Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio Maria Pallavicini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1674BornCremona
31 Aug 169824.2Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 172450.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
1 Oct 172450.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
23 Sep 174369.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
23 Jul 174975.1DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Pallavicini:
Patriarch Antonio Maria Pallavicini (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014