Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Pitoni

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Himeria

Titular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1666Born
12 Nov 172862.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
14 Nov 172862.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)
4 Apr 172962.9DiedTitular Bishop of Hemeria (Himeria)

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Pitoni
Bishop Francesco Maria Pitoni (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Himeria

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast