Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Negroni

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1674Born
28 Oct 172854.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 172854.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
3 Feb 172954.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
11 Mar 173560.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea

MicroData Summary for Nicola Negroni
Archbishop Nicola Negroni (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Sebastea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 6.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 348
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast