Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Caracciolo, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1674Born
20 Dec 169824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
24 Apr 172853.5AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
25 Apr 172853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
11 Aug 175782.8DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Caracciolo
Bishop Francesco Caracciolo O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast