Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Delli Frangi

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1634³Born
9 Aug 168853.9AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
22 Aug 168854.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
Oct 1714³80.1DiedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Delli Frangi
Bishop Sebastiano Delli Frangi (born , died Oct 1714) Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast