Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Antonio Cardinal Ansidei

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1671BornPerugia
4 Apr 172250.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jun 172452.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
9 Jul 172452.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
9 Dec 172655.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Dec 172655.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Perugia, Italy
30 Apr 172856.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 172856.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
6 Jul 172957.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
14 Feb 173058.4DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Ansidei:
Marco Antonio Cardinal Ansidei (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Dec 1726
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015