Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Cavedi (Chevedo), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1667BornPaderno
23 Sep 169022.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Sep 172961.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Comacchio, Italy
7 Sep 172961.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
11 Sep 172961.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
3 Mar 174476.3SucceededBishop of Comacchio, Italy
24 Dec 174477.2DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Cavedi (Chevedo):
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Cavedi (Chevedo) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Comacchio

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1741
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 165, and Page 196
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015