Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cherubino Tommaso Nobilione, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1668BornSurrentin
26 Oct 169224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Jul 172657.8AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
18 Aug 172657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
9 Dec 172658.2AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
17 May 174374.6ResignedBishop of Andria, Italy
23 Oct 175789.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cherubino Tommaso Nobilione:
Bishop Cherubino Tommaso Nobilione O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Andria

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 85, and Page 109
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014