Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Claude Sommier

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1661Born
22 Dec 168524.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 172563.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
11 Feb 172563.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
5 Oct 173776.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia

MicroData Summary for Jean Claude Sommier:
Archbishop Jean Claude Sommier (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 133
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013