Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Alberoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Málaga

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1664BornFiorenzuola d’Arda, Italy
12 Jul 171753.1Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 171753.5AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
12 Jun 172460.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
18 Nov 172561.4Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
19 Nov 172561.4ResignedBishop of Málaga, Spain
20 Sep 172864.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
29 Aug 174076.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
26 Jun 175288.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Alberoni:
Giulio Cardinal Alberoni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Málaga

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
  • a cardinal for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1717
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 43, Number 163

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015