Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Ottoboni


Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


2 Jul 1667BornVenice, Italy
7 Nov 168922.3Elevated to Cardinal
14 Nov 168922.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
170234.4AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
26 Jun 172456.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
13 Jul 172457.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jul 172457.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 172557.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
4 Feb 172557.5Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
14 Jun 172658.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
1730²62.4AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
24 Jul 173063.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
15 Dec 173467.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
3 Sep 173871.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
29 Feb 174072.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ottoboni:
Pietro Cardinal Ottoboni (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 15.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
  • a cardinal for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Nov 1689
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 7


Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches


About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015