Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Cianci

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1649BornCastelgrande
1 Nov 168839.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 168940.7AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
30 Nov 168940.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
Oct 1696³47.6DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Cianci:
Bishop Fabrizio Cianci (born ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a priest for 7.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,109
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013