Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Minotto Ottoboni

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1675BornVenetiis
26 Mar 170125.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172651.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
25 Dec 172651.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
8 Feb 173054.5AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
9 Dec 174267.4DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Minotto Ottoboni:
Bishop Giovanni Minotto Ottoboni (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 283, and Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013